THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chicago, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Childern
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7938
Fax: (416) 813-5663

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Chicago, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Childern
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7938
Fax: (416) 813-5663

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAITREYA SON-MEY COFFEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COFFEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAITREYA SON-MEY COFFEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COFFEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chicago, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005