THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:47:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HAMAD GENERAL HOSPITAL
TRAUMA AND ACUTE CARE SURGERY
ALRAYYAN STREET
DOHA PO.BOX3050
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0097450400898
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Libya
Qatar

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HAMAD GENERAL HOSPITAL
TRAUMA AND ACUTE CARE SURGERY
ALRAYYAN STREET
DOHA PO.BOX3050
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0097450400898
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Libya
Qatar

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED EMHEMMED ELLABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLABIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED EMHEMMED ELLABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLABIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2005