THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:47:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Adelaide Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Adelaide Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Adelaide Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1994
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
16 Dec 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
07 Nov 2005 to 15 Dec 2005
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 16 Dec 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 07 Nov 2005 to 15 Dec 2005
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2005