THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:49:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1300 Carling Ave
Lilac Lane Institute
209
Ottawa ON K1Z 7L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 421-4100
Fax: (844) 921-1018
Address: The Ottawa Hospital -General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5 Jeremiah Place
Ottawa, Ontario
K2H 8L7
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8L7
Phone: 6138946096
Fax: 6134213591
Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tomas Fogl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1300 Carling Ave
Lilac Lane Institute
209
Ottawa ON K1Z 7L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 421-4100
Fax: (844) 921-1018
Address: The Ottawa Hospital -General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5 Jeremiah Place
Ottawa, Ontario
K2H 8L7
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8L7
Phone: 6138946096
Fax: 6134213591
Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tomas Fogl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMAS FOGL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOGL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMAS FOGL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOGL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2005