THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:02:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Antioquia, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Previous patients of Dr. Isaza-Zapata can contact Hamilton Health Sciences at 905-521-2100 ext. 75123 to obtain a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 09 Jan 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gloria Isaza-Zapata Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Antioquia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Previous patients of Dr. Isaza-Zapata can contact Hamilton Health Sciences at 905-521-2100 ext. 75123 to obtain a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 09 Jan 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gloria Isaza-Zapata Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Antioquia, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 18 Dec 2019
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2005