THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Nelson St
Ottawa ON K1N 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-789-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-7377600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Nelson St
Ottawa ON K1N 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-789-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-7377600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA GABA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA GABA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2006