THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:15:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HSIAO-MING JUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HSIAO-MING JUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2006