THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:56:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universite De Yaounde I, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Oct 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Issack Biyong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Universite De Yaounde I, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Oct 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Issack Biyong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universite De Yaounde I, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2006