THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 02 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 02 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 May 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006