THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:12:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
Room D105
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Address: 40 Ruskin
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Pulmonary Hypertension Clinic
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: 613-696-7081
Fax: 613-696-7165

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
Room D105
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Address: 40 Ruskin
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Pulmonary Hypertension Clinic
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: 613-696-7081
Fax: 613-696-7165

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Nov 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 25 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vladimir Contreras Dominguez may practise medicine independently in
internal medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vladimir Contreras Dominguez may practise medicine independently in
internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006