THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:27:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
15 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
10 Apr 2006 to 14 Jun 2006
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 15 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 10 Apr 2006 to 14 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2006