THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:26:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9-683 Great Northern Rd
Axia Health
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 5A1
Phone: (705) 256-4710
Fax: (705) 759-3874

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9-683 Great Northern Rd
Axia Health
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 5A1
Phone: (705) 256-4710
Fax: (705) 759-3874

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOELIUS KURNIAWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURNIAWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOELIUS KURNIAWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURNIAWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2006