THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wisconsin, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawthorne Village Medical Clinic
Suite 205
10220 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-0676
Fax: (905) 878-0521

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George R. Gleisner II Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Wisconsin, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawthorne Village Medical Clinic
Suite 205
10220 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-0676
Fax: (905) 878-0521

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George R. Gleisner II Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Sep 2007
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 11 2007
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. George Richard Gleisner II may practise Family Medicine
independently.

2. Dr. Gleisner II may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr.
Gleisner II is educated and experienced.

3. Dr. Gleisner II's practice is restricted to patients over the age of four
and excludes obstetrics.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. George Richard Gleisner II may practise Family Medicine
independently.

2. Dr. Gleisner II may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr.
Gleisner II is educated and experienced.

3. Dr. Gleisner II's practice is restricted to patients over the age of four
and excludes obstetrics.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wisconsin, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 May 2006