THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:57:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Nephrology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 309343
Fax: (416) 813-6271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Nephrology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 309343
Fax: (416) 813-6271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christoph Paul Benedikt Licht may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Paediatrics, Division of Nephrology, University of
Toronto, in which Dr. Licht holds a geographical full-time teaching
or research appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Licht no longer holds
the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christoph Paul Benedikt Licht may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Paediatrics, Division of Nephrology, University of
Toronto, in which Dr. Licht holds a geographical full-time teaching
or research appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Licht no longer holds
the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Apr 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 May 2006