THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:45:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Drive
Health Sciences Centre
Medical Services, Room 1325
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 709-777-6300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Drive
Health Sciences Centre
Medical Services, Room 1325
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 709-777-6300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE CHEW LOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE CHEW LOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006