THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:51:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room D1-236A
800 Commissioners Rd E, PO Box 5010
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 685 8500
Extension: 56447
Fax: 519-685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Solh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Solh (CPSO#: 84398 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room D1-236A
800 Commissioners Rd E, PO Box 5010
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 685 8500
Extension: 56447
Fax: 519-685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Solh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Solh (CPSO#: 84398 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZIAD SOLH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZIAD SOLH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006