THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jiwaji University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jiwaji University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jiwaji University, 1985
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Cardiology
04 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 04 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2006