THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:21:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Student Wellness Centre
Peter George Center for Living and Learning
Level 2
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-525-9140
Extension: 27700
Fax: 1 855 383 4077
Address: Virtual Physician, Please fax
See below ON N/A
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 647-362-0401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Student Wellness Centre
Peter George Center for Living and Learning
Level 2
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-525-9140
Extension: 27700
Fax: 1 855 383 4077
Address: Virtual Physician, Please fax
See below ON N/A
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 647-362-0401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD GRYNSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYNSPAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD GRYNSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYNSPAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006