THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kivi, Jennifer Joy (Used Until: 16 Nov 2006)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Norwest Community Health Centre
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548
Address: 225 Richmond Street West
Maple
Primary Care
Online Platform
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W3
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 1-888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

General Information

Former Name: Kivi, Jennifer Joy (Used Until: 16 Nov 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Norwest Community Health Centre
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548
Address: 225 Richmond Street West
Maple
Primary Care
Online Platform
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W3
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 1-888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JOY LAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JOY LAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006