THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Unit 304
255 Lalewood Drive
Halifax NS B3M 4G2
Date Received: 17 Jun 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Heughan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Unit 304
255 Lalewood Drive
Halifax NS B3M 4G2
Date Received: 17 Jun 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Heughan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006