THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:46:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: D2-1036 Princess St
Kingston ON K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-546-9721
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Arrowsmith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: D2-1036 Princess St
Kingston ON K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-546-9721
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Arrowsmith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH CATHARINE ARROWSMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARROWSMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH CATHARINE ARROWSMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARROWSMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006