THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1128 Hornby Street
Three Bridges CHC
Vancouver British Columbia V6Z 2L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-331-8900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Everett Chalmers Hospital
PO Box 9000
700 Priestman Street
Fredericton, NB E3B 5N5
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1128 Hornby Street
Three Bridges CHC
Vancouver British Columbia V6Z 2L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-331-8900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Everett Chalmers Hospital
PO Box 9000
700 Priestman Street
Fredericton, NB E3B 5N5
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL STEPHEN QUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL STEPHEN QUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006