THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC FADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC FADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006