THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:26:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEANOR LEE SHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHIN is enrolled at University Of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEANOR LEE SHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHIN is enrolled at University Of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006