THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:17:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Orner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 May 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Orner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 May 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC ORNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC ORNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006