THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 12:06:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Brown University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169211066
Fax: (416) 921-8459

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Mar 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 06 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Brown University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169211066
Fax: (416) 921-8459

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Mar 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 06 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRIPLER PELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRIPLER PELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Brown University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006