THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:58:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
Floor 18 Room 606
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Extension: 5524
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
Floor 18 Room 606
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Extension: 5524
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jul 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Muhammed Hatem Abdel Aleem Krema may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Ophthalmology and Vision Sciences, University of Toronto, in which
Dr. Krema holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Krema no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Muhammed Hatem Abdel Aleem Krema may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Ophthalmology and Vision Sciences, University of Toronto, in which
Dr. Krema holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Krema no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006