THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:48:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Craig St
Russell Ontario K4R 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-445-5333
Fax: 613-445-3659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noorani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Noorani (CPSO#: 85136 )
Business Address: 110 Craig Street
Russell Ontario K4R 1A1
8197433840

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Craig St
Russell Ontario K4R 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-445-5333
Fax: 613-445-3659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noorani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Noorani (CPSO#: 85136 )
Business Address: 110 Craig Street
Russell Ontario K4R 1A1
8197433840

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMIDAH NOORANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMIDAH NOORANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006