THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:36:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Arizona
Department of Surgery
PO Box 245066
1501 North Campbell Avenue
Tucson Arizona 85724-5066
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (520) 626-2653
Fax: (520) 626-1411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Arizona
Department of Surgery
PO Box 245066
1501 North Campbell Avenue
Tucson Arizona 85724-5066
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (520) 626-2653
Fax: (520) 626-1411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAN GHADERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADERI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAN GHADERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADERI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006