THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITAS PADJADJARAN, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, INDONESIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, INDONESIAN
Medical School: UNIVERSITAS PADJADJARAN, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROLINAH LUKITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKITTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROLINAH LUKITTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKITTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITAS PADJADJARAN, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006