THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:42:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
28 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Queen's University
AVP - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2008 to 27 Oct 2008
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 28 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Oct 2008
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2006