THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 01:22:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 06 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 02 Sep 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2006