THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2006