THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 19:55:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Geriatrics Assessment Program
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 53013
Fax: (905) 358-4972
Address: Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45501
Fax: (905) 704-4435
Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
Department of Hospital Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 33016
Fax: (905) 788-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Geriatrics Assessment Program
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 53013
Fax: (905) 358-4972
Address: Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45501
Fax: (905) 704-4435
Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
Department of Hospital Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 33016
Fax: (905) 788-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL NANDAKUMAR PUVENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUVENDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL NANDAKUMAR PUVENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUVENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006