THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:15:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)901-9672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)901-9672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLLEEN ANN FORESTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORESTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLLEEN ANN FORESTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORESTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2006