THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:14:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adnan Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adnan Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Jun 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 03 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Adnan Mohammad Sheikh may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Adnan Mohammad Sheikh may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2006