THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:55:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 1998
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Oct 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Oct 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2006