THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 01:18:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1990
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
27 Oct 2006 to 26 Sep 2007
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
27 Sep 2006 to 26 Oct 2006
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 27 Oct 2006 to 26 Sep 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 27 Sep 2006 to 26 Oct 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Oct 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2006