THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:15:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1999
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
08 Nov 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
01 Oct 2006 to 07 Nov 2006
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 08 Nov 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Oct 2006 to 07 Nov 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2006