THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:12:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 6B
9 Elgin St E
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335
Address: 19 James St W
Streamway Villa LTC
Cobourg ON K9A 2J8
Phone: 905-372-0163
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 6B
9 Elgin St E
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335
Address: 19 James St W
Streamway Villa LTC
Cobourg ON K9A 2J8
Phone: 905-372-0163
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN THOMAS DAHLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN THOMAS DAHLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2006