THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:27:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Allison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Allison (CPSO#: 85771 )
Business Address: Suite 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 522-9101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Allison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Allison (CPSO#: 85771 )
Business Address: Suite 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 522-9101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JAMES ALLISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JAMES ALLISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2006