THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 15:01:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1307 W League City Pkwy
League City TX 77573-6313
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 281-332-2626
Fax: 281-332-7272

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 06 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Talha Ghadai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kasmani (CPSO#: 96896 ) Dr. T. Ghadai (CPSO#: 85821 )
Business Address: 3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0B1
(416) 792-2654
Business Address: 186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa Ontario L1J 5Y2
(905) 576-5181
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH, URDU
Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1307 W League City Pkwy
League City TX 77573-6313
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 281-332-2626
Fax: 281-332-7272

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 06 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Talha Ghadai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kasmani (CPSO#: 96896 ) Dr. T. Ghadai (CPSO#: 85821 )
Business Address: 3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough Ontario M1P 0B1
(416) 792-2654
Business Address: 186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa Ontario L1J 5Y2
(905) 576-5181
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TALHA ISMAEEL GHADAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TALHA ISMAEEL GHADAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2007