THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 03:27:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2007