THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:35:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology
26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
27 Mar 2007 to 13 Apr 2007
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology
03 Jan 2007 to 26 Mar 2007
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology
DATE: 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 27 Mar 2007 to 13 Apr 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 03 Jan 2007 to 26 Mar 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2007