THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:18:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Grafton Street
Suite LL-3
Charlottetown Prince Edward Island C1A 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (902) 368-8029
Fax: (902) 629-1820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ontario Document Services. They can be reached at 1-877-560-4637 or at [email protected].
Date Received: 21 Oct 2021

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. A. Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sutherland (CPSO#: 85886 )
Business Address: Suite 409
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 222-7697

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Grafton Street
Suite LL-3
Charlottetown Prince Edward Island C1A 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (902) 368-8029
Fax: (902) 629-1820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ontario Document Services. They can be reached at 1-877-560-4637 or at [email protected].
Date Received: 21 Oct 2021

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. A. Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sutherland (CPSO#: 85886 )
Business Address: Suite 409
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 222-7697

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIINA ANNE SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIINA ANNE SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2007