THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:39:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: University of Ottawa Helath Services
100 Marie-Curie
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: University of Ottawa Helath Services
100 Marie-Curie
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2007