THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:50:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 526-6250
Fax: (905) 526-9745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Karpilow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Karpilow (CPSO#: 85959 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 526-6250
Fax: (905) 526-9745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Karpilow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Karpilow (CPSO#: 85959 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jan 2009
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 29 2009
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Craig Karpilow may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Craig Karpilow may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Oct 2017
Summary:
Effective November 17, 2018, Dr. Karpilow has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Oct 2017
Summary:
Effective November 17, 2018, Dr. Karpilow has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Oct 2017
Summary:
Effective November 17, 2018, Dr. Karpilow has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Oct 2017
Summary:
Effective November 17, 2018, Dr. Karpilow has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007