THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:29:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Madras, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tower C
Suite 117
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Extension: 8607
Fax: (613) 775-0095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Madras, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tower C
Suite 117
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Extension: 8607
Fax: (613) 775-0095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Madras, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2007