THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:10:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWEDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-59 Adelaide St E
Scarborough Village Residence
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5C 1K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165914411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWEDISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-59 Adelaide St E
Scarborough Village Residence
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5C 1K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165914411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFAN DAVID BARAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFAN DAVID BARAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2007