THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:27:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
24 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
24 Jul 2011 to 23 Jul 2012
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
24 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
24 Jul 2009 to 23 Jul 2010
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
24 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
24 Jul 2007 to 23 Jul 2008
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Neurology
01 May 2007 to 23 Jul 2007
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 24 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Jul 2011 to 23 Jul 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Jul 2009 to 23 Jul 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Jul 2007 to 23 Jul 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Neurology
DATE: 01 May 2007 to 23 Jul 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2007